Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Efraín Mendoza Cruz

Auxiliary Bishop of Tlalnepantla, México

Titular Bishop of Cubda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1959 BornTlalnepantla
12 Oct 198727.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Tlalnepantla, México, México
18 Oct 198828.9Ordained PriestPriest of Tlalnepantla, México, México
4 Jun 201151.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tlalnepantla, México, México
4 Jun 201151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cubda
27 Jul 201151.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cubda

MicroData Summary for Efraín Mendoza Cruz:
Bishop Efraín Mendoza Cruz (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tlalnepantla

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Tlalnepantla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Jun 2011
  • ob/c01: CB, 28 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,119

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013