Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Cecilio Gómez de Carpena y Bolio

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Olena

Titular See: (Abad de Guadalupe)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1785Born
23 Dec 180924.0Ordained PriestPriest
22 Sep 186478.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
27 Nov 186479.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
5 Oct 186882.8DiedTitular Bishop of Olena

MicroData Summary for Agustín Cecilio Gómez de Carpena y Bolio
Bishop Agustín Cecilio Gómez de Carpena y Bolio (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Olena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopN.D. de Guadeloupe, México, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 424
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1864, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 31 Jan 2017