Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luis Fletes Santana

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Thunusuda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1947 BornRancho Viejo de los Fletes
15 Dec 197528.0Ordained PriestPriest of México, Federal District
29 Jan 200052.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
29 Jan 200052.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
4 Mar 200052.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thunusuda
31 May 200355.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for José Luis Fletes Santana:
Bishop José Luis Fletes Santana (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of México

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of México.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,709

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013