Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvino Ramírez y Cueva

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of California Inferiore

Titular Bishop of Verinopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1866BornTecolotlán
6 Dec 188923.2Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 192154.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of California Inferiore, México
16 Jun 192154.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
13 Nov 192155.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Verinopolis
9 Dec 192155.2InstalledVicar Apostolic of California Inferiore, México
15 Sep 192256.0DiedVicar Apostolic of California Inferiore, México

MicroData Summary for Silvino Ramírez y Cueva:
Bishop Silvino Ramírez y Cueva (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of California Inferiore

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 83

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013