Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Manuel de Irrizarri y Peralta

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Caesarea in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1789BornHabana, Cuba
24 May 181223.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 184050.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
27 Apr 184050.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
15 Nov 184051.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caesarea in Palaestina
27 Mar 184959.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Juan Manuel de Irrizarri y Peralta
Archbishop Juan Manuel de Irrizarri y Peralta (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

  • a priest for 36.8 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 124
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1840, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016