Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan Pérez de la Serna

Deceased

Bishop of Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1570¹BornCervera del Llano, Spain
13 May 161343.3AppointedArchbishop of México, Federal District
19 Jul 162757.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Zamora, Spain
8 Aug 163161.6DiedBishop of Zamora, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan Pérez de la Serna:
Archbishop Juan Pérez de la Serna (died ) Bishop of Zamora

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 141, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 240, and Page 376
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 130, Number 829
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1613, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015