Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis de Cañizares, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1580Born
20 Jan 159919.0ProfessedMember of Order of the Minims
1 Jul 162444.5AppointedBishop of Nueva Caceres, Philippines
19 Jun 162848.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Comayagua, Honduras
162949.0SucceededBishop of Comayagua, Honduras
4 Jul 164565.5DiedBishop of Comayagua, Honduras

MicroData Summary for Luis de Cañizares
Bishop Luis de Cañizares O.M. (born 1580, died ) Bishop of Comayagua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMadrid, Spain

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 125, and Page 157
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 146, Number 931
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1624, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018