Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo Hernandez y Hermosillo y Gonzalez, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1560¹Born
12 Oct 162060.7AppointedBishop of Durango, México
30 Nov 162161.9Ordained BishopBishop of Durango, México
28 Jan 163171.0DiedBishop of Durango, México

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Hernandez y Hermosillo y Gonzalez
Bishop Gonzalo Hernandez y Hermosillo y Gonzalez O.S.A. (born 1560, died ) Bishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMéxico

  • a bishop for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,250
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 178
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1621, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018