Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Miguel García Serrano, O.E.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Manila


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1569²BornChinchón, Spain
1592²23.0ProfessedMember of Order of Hermits of St. Augustine
3 Aug 161647.5AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
1617²48.0Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Feb 161849.1AppointedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines
14 Jun 162960.4DiedArchbishop of Manila, Philippines

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Miguel García Serrano:
Archbishop Miguel García Serrano O.E.S.A. (born 1569, died ) Archbishop of Manila

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 261, and Page 230
  • b/c2: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 135, Number 863
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1617, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 7 Jan 2016