Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquín Acadio Pagaza y Ordóñez

Deceased

Bishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1839Born
19 May 186425.3Ordained PriestPriest
18 Mar 189556.1AppointedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
1 May 189556.3Ordained BishopBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
11 Jun 189556.4InstalledBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México
11 Sep 191879.6DiedBishop of Veracruz-Jalapa, México

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Acadio Pagaza y Ordóñez
Bishop Joaquín Acadio Pagaza y Ordóñez (born , died ) Bishop of Veracruz-Jalapa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValle de Bravo, Archdiocese of México, Federal District
Ordained BishopLa Professa, Mexico, Archdiocese of México, Federal District

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 586
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1895, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jun 2017