Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gonzalo de Salazar, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1559BornMéxico
2 Jun 160848.4AppointedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
160949.0InstalledBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México
3 Aug 163676.5DiedBishop of Yucatán (Mérida), México

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo de Salazar:
Bishop Gonzalo de Salazar O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Yucatán (Mérida)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015