Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillaume Piguel, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

Titular Bishop of Canatha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Dec 1722BornLa Mézière, France
21 Dec 174826.0Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 Jul 176239.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam
29 Jul 176239.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Canatha
9 Dec 176442.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Canatha
21 Jun 177148.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Guillaume Piguel:
Bishop Guillaume Piguel M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Cochin {Cocincina}

  • a priest for 22.5 years
  • a bishop for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1764, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 145, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 29 Nov 2015