Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Michael Miranda

Bishop of Gulbarga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1952 BornKirem
4 May 197826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Mangalore, India
24 Jun 200553.2AppointedBishop of Gulbarga, India
18 Aug 200553.4Ordained BishopBishop of Gulbarga, India

MicroData Summary for Robert Michael Miranda:
Bishop Robert Michael Miranda (born ) Bishop of Gulbarga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gulbarga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,962

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013