Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond D’Mello

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Allahabad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1907BornKirem
24 Apr 193730.0Ordained PriestPriest
5 Feb 195951.8AppointedBishop of Mangalore, India
6 Apr 195952.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mangalore, India
21 Apr 196457.0AppointedBishop of Allahabad, India
20 Dec 196962.7ResignedBishop of Allahabad, India
20 Dec 196962.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Glenndálocha
Dec 1970³63.6ResignedTitular Bishop of Glenndálocha
24 Nov 197164.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Allahabad, India

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raymond D’Mello:
Bishop Raymond D’Mello (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Allahabad

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015