Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert Conrad de Vito, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lucknow, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1904Born
11 Jun 192723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
12 Dec 194642.7AppointedBishop of Lucknow, India
16 Feb 194742.9Ordained BishopBishop of Lucknow, India
16 Nov 197066.6DiedBishop of Lucknow, India

MicroData Summary for Albert Conrad de Vito
Bishop Albert Conrad de Vito O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Lucknow

EventPlace
Birth PlaceProvvidenti

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1947, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast