Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Isaac Lobo

Bishop of Udupi, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1949 Born
5 May 197727.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Dec 199950.0AppointedBishop of Shimoga, India
20 Mar 200050.3Ordained BishopBishop of Shimoga, India
16 Jul 201262.6AppointedBishop of Udupi, India
15 Oct 201262.9InstalledBishop of Udupi, India

MicroData Summary for Gerald Isaac Lobo
Bishop Gerald Isaac Lobo (born ) Bishop of Udupi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAgrar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Udupi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,718
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jul 2012
  • i: CB, 11 Oct 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018