Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ruggero Luigi Emidio Cardinal Antici Mattei

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1811Born
25 Mar 183423.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Sep 183423.4Ordained PriestPriest
1850²38.7AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
8 Jan 186654.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
25 Feb 186654.9Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Constantinople
1875²63.7ResignedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
15 Mar 187563.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Sep 187564.4Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jan 187664.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna
21 Apr 188372.0DiedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ruggero Luigi Emidio Antici Mattei
Ruggero Luigi Emidio Cardinal Antici Mattei (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Panisperna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRecanati, Diocese of Recanati e Loreto, Italy
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Peter's, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
  • a cardinal for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Mar 1875
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 224, and Page 49
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1866, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 May 2017