Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Carmine Cardinal Gori-Merosi

Deceased

Secretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

Cardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres

Abbot of Subiaco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1810BornSubiaco
30 Mar 188272.1AppointedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
10 Nov 188474.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Nov 188474.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria ad Martyres
24 Nov 188474.8AppointedAbbot of Subiaco, Italy
15 Sep 188676.6DiedSecretary of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

MicroData Summary for Carmine Gori-Merosi:
Cardinal Carmine Gori-Merosi (born , died ) Secretary of Sacred Consistorial Congregation

  • a cardinal for 1.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Nov 1884

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013