Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloísio Alberto Dilli, O.F.M.

Bishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1948 Born
4 Feb 197122.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1 Jan 197728.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
27 Jun 200759.0AppointedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
2 Sep 200759.1Ordained BishopBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
30 Sep 200759.2InstalledBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Jul 201668.0AppointedBishop of Santa Cruz do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Aloísio Alberto Dilli
Bishop Aloísio Alberto Dilli O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Santa Cruz do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontenegro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Cruz do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 27 Jun 2007
  • ob/i/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,501
  • ab: Bollettino, 13 Jul 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast