Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Carlos Rossi Keller

Bishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1953 BornSão Paulo
24 Jun 197724.3Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jun 200855.3AppointedBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
2 Aug 200855.4Ordained BishopBishop of Frederico Westphalen, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Carlos Rossi Keller:
Bishop Antônio Carlos Rossi Keller (born ) Bishop of Frederico Westphalen

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Frederico Westphalen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,939

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013