Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Pedro Kohl, P.S.D.P.

Bishop of Osório, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1954 Born
2 Feb 197722.1ProfessedMember of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
2 Sep 198429.7Ordained PriestPriest of Poveri Servi della Divina Provvidenza
15 Nov 200651.9AppointedBishop of Osório, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
4 Feb 200752.1Ordained BishopBishop of Osório, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
11 Mar 200752.2InstalledBishop of Osório, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jaime Pedro Kohl
Bishop Jaime Pedro Kohl P.S.D.P. (born ) Bishop of Osório

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSalvador do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Osório.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 13 Jan 2018