Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Remídio José Bohn

Deceased

Bishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1950Born
29 Nov 197525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 Jan 200655.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 Jan 200655.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Uchi Maius
17 Mar 200655.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uchi Maius
28 Dec 201161.6AppointedBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Feb 201261.7InstalledBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
6 Jan 201867.6DiedBishop of Cachoeira do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Remídio José Bohn
Bishop Remídio José Bohn (born , died ) Bishop of Cachoeira do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFeliz
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto Alegre, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul
Death PlaceLar Sacerdotal, Gravataí

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,089
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Dec 2011
  • i: CB, 28 Dec 2011
  • d: CB, 6 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 9 Jan 2018