Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Redovino Rizzardo, C.S. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1939Born
9 Jul 196728.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
3 Jan 200161.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
25 Mar 200161.9Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
5 Dec 200162.6SucceededBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
21 Oct 201576.5RetiredBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
6 Nov 201677.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Redovino Rizzardo (VIAF: 39421776)
Bishop Redovino Rizzardo C.S. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dourados

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBenito Gonçalves

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 15.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,946
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2015
  • d: CB, 6 Nov 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast