Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ettore Dotti, C.S.F.

Bishop of Naviraí, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1961 Born
6 Sep 198827.6ProfessedMember of Congregazione Sacra Famiglia di Bergamo
19 Mar 199332.2Perpetual VowsMember of Congregazione Sacra Famiglia di Bergamo
28 Jun 199433.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregazione Sacra Famiglia di Bergamo
1 Jun 201150.4AppointedBishop of Naviraí, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
22 Jul 201150.5Ordained BishopBishop of Naviraí, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
31 Jul 201150.5InstalledBishop of Naviraí, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Ettore Dotti
Bishop Ettore Dotti C.S.F. (born ) Bishop of Naviraí

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalosco, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Naviraí.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 20 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast