Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrique Aparecido de Lima, C.SS.R.

Bishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jul 1964 BornAssis Chateaubriand
29 Jan 199530.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
20 Nov 199935.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
21 Oct 201551.2AppointedBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
30 Jan 201651.5Ordained BishopBishop of Dourados, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Henrique Aparecido de Lima:
Bishop Henrique Aparecido de Lima C.SS.R. (born ) Bishop of Dourados

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Dourados.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2015
  • nm/bp: CB, 21 Oct 2015
  • ob: CB, 30 Oct 2015
  • c2+: CB, 30 Nov 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 1 Dec 2015