Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Ercílio Simon

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Sep 1941Born
12 Dec 196524.2Ordained PriestPriest of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
24 Oct 199049.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
30 Dec 199049.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Cruz Alta, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
5 Jul 199553.7AppointedBishop of Uruguaiana, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
16 Sep 199856.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
19 May 199957.6SucceededBishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
13 Apr 201169.5AppointedArchbishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
11 Jul 201270.8ResignedArchbishop of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
1 Jun 202078.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Ercílio Simon
Archbishop Pedro Ercílio Simon (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Passo Fundo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLagoa Vermelha, Ibiaçá
Ordained BishopN. Sra Aparecida, Cathedral, Passo Fundo, Diocese of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul
Death PlaceSão Vicente de Paulo, Hospital, Passo Fundo, Archdiocese of Passo Fundo, Rio Grande do Sul

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,436
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 1 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 2 Jun 2020

Quantcast