Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Carmelo Ruffinoni, C.S.

Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1943 Born
2 Oct 196118.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
8 Mar 197026.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Missionaries of Saint Charles Borromeo
18 Jan 200662.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
18 Jan 200662.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
17 Mar 200662.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
16 Jun 201066.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
6 Jul 201167.8SucceededBishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
26 Jun 201975.8RetiredBishop of Caxias do Sul, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Carmelo Ruffinoni
Bishop Alessandro Carmelo Ruffinoni C.S. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Sul

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiazza Brembana, Diocese of Bergamo, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Porto Alegre, Archdiocese of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caxias do Sul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Jan 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,090
  • ab: Bollettino, 16 Jun 2010
  • s: Bollettino, 6 Jul 2011
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2019
  • bpd: AM, 8 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast