Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Clemente Weber

Bishop Emeritus of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1937 Born
22 Dec 196225.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Mar 199456.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto Alegre, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
23 Mar 199456.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
5 Jun 199456.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gummi in Byzacena
15 Jun 200466.7AppointedBishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil
24 Apr 201375.5RetiredBishop of Santo Ângelo, Rio Grande do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Clemente Weber
Bishop José Clemente Weber (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Santo Ângelo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenâncio Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santo Ângelo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,327
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Apr 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast