Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Carlos Félix

Bishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1957 BornCaldas
20 Dec 198629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Feb 200345.2AppointedBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
4 May 200345.4Ordained BishopBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 May 200345.5InstalledBishop of Luz, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Mar 201456.3AppointedBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil
18 May 201456.5InstalledBishop of Governador Valadares, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Carlos Félix:
Bishop Antônio Carlos Félix (born ) Bishop of Governador Valadares

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Governador Valadares.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 171, Number 14,372
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2014
  • i: CB, 18 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 May 2014