Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Costa Campos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1918BornTrês Pontas
29 Mar 194122.6Ordained PriestPriest of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
9 Dec 196042.3AppointedBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
24 Feb 196142.5Ordained BishopBishop of Valença, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
26 Mar 197960.6AppointedBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 Feb 198970.5ResignedBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
10 Jul 199778.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Costa Campos:
Bishop José Costa Campos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Divinópolis

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013