Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Bartolomeu Maria Priante, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1883Born
28 Jan 191228.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
13 May 193349.5AppointedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
23 Jul 193349.7Ordained BishopBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
4 Dec 194461.1DiedBishop of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vicente Bartolomeu Maria Priante
Bishop Vicente Bartolomeu Maria Priante S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Corumbá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBarra Mansa

  • a priest for 32.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast