Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Zacarias Rolim de Moura

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cajazeiras, Paraiba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1914BornUmari
8 Dec 193723.4Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 195338.8AppointedBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
26 Jul 195339.1Ordained BishopBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
12 Jul 199076.0RetiredBishop of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil
5 Apr 199277.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Cajazeiras, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Zacarias Rolim de Moura:
Bishop Zacarias Rolim de Moura (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cajazeiras

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015