Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Deodato Rodrigues de Carvalho

Deceased

Bishop of São Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1826Born
25 Jul 185023.8Ordained PriestPriest
22 May 187245.6SelectedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
29 Jul 187245.8AppointedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
9 Mar 187346.4Ordained BishopBishop of São Paulo, Brazil
19 Aug 189467.9DiedBishop of São Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Lino Deodato Rodrigues de Carvalho (VIAF: 18307230)
Bishop Lino Deodato Rodrigues de Carvalho (born , died ) Bishop of São Paulo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Bernardo das Russas, Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará)
Ordained BishopSão José, Cathedral, Fortaleza, Diocese of Fortaleza (Ceará)

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,539
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 444
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017