Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Geraldo Nascimento, O.F.M. Cap.

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fortaleza, Ceara

Titular Bishop of Zama Major


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 May 1936 BornSenador Pompeu
29 Jun 196731.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
10 Sep 198246.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil
10 Sep 198246.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zama Major
22 Dec 198246.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zama Major
22 Jan 199760.7ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Fortaleza, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Geraldo Nascimento:
Bishop Geraldo Nascimento O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fortaleza

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Fortaleza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013