Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Timóteo Francisco Nemésio Pereira Cordeiro, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1928Born
15 Mar 195324.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
13 Mar 197142.9AppointedBishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil
4 Jul 197143.2Ordained BishopBishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil
20 Mar 199062.0DiedBishop of Tianguá, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Timóteo Francisco Nemésio Pereira Cordeiro
Bishop Timóteo Francisco Nemésio Pereira Cordeiro O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Tianguá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCanindé

  • a priest for 37.0 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018