Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paulo Mendes Peixoto

Archbishop of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1951 Born
8 Dec 197928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Caratinga, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Dec 200554.7AppointedBishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Feb 200655.0Ordained BishopBishop of São José do Rio Preto, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Mar 201261.0AppointedArchbishop of Uberaba, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Mendes Peixoto
Archbishop Paulo Mendes Peixoto (born ) Archbishop of Uberaba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceImbé

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Uberaba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,072
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Mar 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018