Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Cayetano Da Annunciação Brandão, T.O.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Braga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1740BornComarca de Estarreja
28 Nov 175919.2ProfessedMember of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
17 Mar 176423.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
22 Sep 176424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Third Order Regular of St. Francis of Penance
8 Aug 178241.9SelectedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
16 Dec 178242.2ConfirmedBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
2 Feb 178342.3Ordained BishopBishop of Belém do Pará, Brazil
20 Nov 178949.1SelectedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
29 Mar 179049.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
28 Jun 179049.7InstalledArchbishop of Braga, Portugal
15 Dec 180565.2DiedArchbishop of Braga, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Cayetano Da Annunciação Brandão:
Archbishop Cayetano Da Annunciação Brandão T.O.R. (born , died ) Archbishop of Braga

  • a priest for 41.2 years
  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 118, and Page 129

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 16 Jan 2016