Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre da Silva Pedrosa Guimarães

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Macau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jul 1727³BornBahia, Brazil
20 Dec 177245.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
29 Dec 177245.4SelectedBishop of Macau, China
8 Mar 177345.6ConfirmedBishop of Macau, China
19 Sep 177346.1Ordained BishopBishop of Macau, China
1 Apr 178961.6ResignedBishop of Macau, China
17 Feb 179971.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Macau, China

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre da Silva Pedrosa Guimarães
Bishop Alexandre da Silva Pedrosa Guimarães (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Macau

  • a bishop for 25.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1773, Number 29
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016