Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Cariati

Deceased

Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1739¹Born
22 Feb 176627.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Cranganore (Angamala), India
15 Mar 176627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Cranganore (Angamala), India
7 Aug 178243.5SelectedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
16 Dec 178243.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
16 Feb 178344.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India
9 Sep 178647.6DiedArchbishop of Cranganore (Angamala), India

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Cariati
Archbishop José Cariati (born 1739, died ) Archbishop of Cranganore (Angamala)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCranganore

  • a priest for 20.4 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017