Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lourenço Correa de Sá e Benevides

Deceased

Bishop of Porto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1741BornGiumaraes
20 May 178039.2Ordained PriestPriest
12 May 179554.1SelectedBishop of Porto, Portugal
18 Dec 179554.7ConfirmedBishop of Porto, Portugal
1 May 179655.1Ordained BishopBishop of Porto, Portugal
6 Jun 179857.2DiedBishop of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Lourenço Correa de Sá e Benevides
Bishop Lourenço Correa de Sá e Benevides (born , died ) Bishop of Porto

  • a priest for 18.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 346
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,083
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1796, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016