Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José da Avé-Maria Leite da Costa e Silva, O.SS.T. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1727BornSanto Antão
1 Mar 174922.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
25 Jan 175023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Most Holy Trinity
7 Sep 178255.6SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
16 Dec 178255.8ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
24 Feb 178356.0Ordained BishopBishop of Angra, Portugal
30 Oct 179972.7DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for José da Avé-Maria Leite da Costa e Silva:
Bishop José da Avé-Maria Leite da Costa e Silva O.SS.T. (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 85
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,495
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 9 Oct 2013