Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Nicolau de Azevedo Coutinho Gentil

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Goiás

Titular Bishop of Zoara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1740³BornLisboa, Portugal
29 Sep 176323.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Oct 176323.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 178241.8AppointedPrelate of Cuiabá, Brazil
18 Jul 178343.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Zoara
14 Dec 178343.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zoara
7 Mar 178847.9AppointedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil
1793¹52.8ResignedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil
1807¹66.8DiedPrelate Emeritus of Goiás, Brazil

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Nicolau de Azevedo Coutinho Gentil:
Bishop José Nicolau de Azevedo Coutinho Gentil (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Goiás

  • a priest for 43.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/ob/c2+: CB, 18 Jul 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 450, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013