Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre da Sagrada Familia Ferreira da Silva, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Angra, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1737Born
28 Dec 176326.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
8 Aug 178245.2SelectedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
16 Dec 178245.5ConfirmedBishop of Malacca, Singapore
24 Feb 178345.7Ordained BishopBishop of Malacca, Singapore
1 Sep 178447.2SelectedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
14 Feb 178547.7ConfirmedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
23 Nov 178750.5ResignedBishop of Angola e Congo, Angola
16 Mar 181577.8SelectedBishop of Angra, Portugal
18 Dec 181578.5ConfirmedBishop of Angra, Portugal
23 Apr 181880.9DiedBishop of Angra, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Alexandre da Sagrada Familia Ferreira da Silva
Bishop Alexandre da Sagrada Familia Ferreira da Silva O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Angra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHorta

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,496
  • ob/ab: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 111
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 76
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 7
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 179, and Page 273

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018