Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente do Espirito Santo, O.A.D. †

Deceased

Prelate of Goiás, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1730Born
22 Sep 175423.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Agostiniani Scalzi
29 Sep 175423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Agostiniani Scalzi
30 Dec 177848.2SelectedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
1 Mar 177948.3ConfirmedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
30 Nov 177949.1Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
25 Nov 178252.1ResignedBishop of São Tomé e Príncipe
17 Dec 178252.1AppointedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil
29 Nov 178858.1DiedPrelate of Goiás, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Vicente do Espirito Santo
Bishop Vicente do Espirito Santo O.A.D. (born , died ) Prelate of Goiás

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBelem près Lisboa

  • a priest for 34.1 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 33
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 405, and Page 455

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017