Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco de São Simão, O.F.M. Ref. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Oct 1726³BornAguda, Portugal
22 Jun 175124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Reformed Friars Minor
30 Dec 177852.1SelectedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
1 Mar 177952.3ConfirmedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
18 Apr 177952.4Ordained BishopBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde
10 Aug 178356.8DiedBishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francisco de São Simão:
Bishop Francisco de São Simão O.F.M. Ref. (born , died ) Bishop of Santiago de Cabo Verde

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 8
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 240

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015