Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacinto Carlos da Silveira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão

Auxiliary Bishop of Évora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1732³BornEvora, Portugal
18 Feb 175825.4Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 177946.4AppointedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
20 Jun 177946.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
1780²47.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Évora, Portugal
29 Apr 178047.6ResignedBishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil
28 Jul 180875.8DiedBishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jacinto Carlos da Silveira:
Bishop Jacinto Carlos da Silveira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 14
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 268, and Page 451

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015