Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingos da Encarnação Pontevel, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1722BornSantarem
10 Oct 174523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
1 Mar 177957.1AppointedBishop of Mariana, Brazil
18 Apr 177957.2Ordained BishopBishop of Mariana, Brazil
16 Jun 179573.4DiedBishop of Mariana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Domingos da Encarnação Pontevel:
Bishop Domingos da Encarnação Pontevel O.P. (died ) Bishop of Mariana

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.1 years

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015