Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João António Barbosa Soares

Deceased

Bishop of Viseu, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1718Born
15 Mar 176647.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
24 May 176647.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 177860.2SelectedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
1 Mar 177960.4ConfirmedBishop of Viseu, Portugal
2 May 177960.6Ordained BishopBishop of Viseu, Portugal
25 Nov 178264.1DiedBishop of Viseu, Portugal

MicroData Summary for João António Barbosa Soares
Bishop João António Barbosa Soares (born , died ) Bishop of Viseu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLordello

  • a priest for 16.5 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1779, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017