Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel António Barreto de Meneses

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Miranda (do Douro)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jul 1723BornBarbudo
23 Sep 174724.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Mar 177046.6SelectedBishop of Bragança, Portugal
6 Aug 177047.0ConfirmedBishop of Bragança, Portugal
28 Oct 177047.2Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança, Portugal
22 Feb 177248.6InstalledBishop of Bragança, Portugal
11 Jun 177349.9SelectedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
12 Jul 177350.0ConfirmedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
16 Feb 177450.5InstalledBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
8 Aug 178057.0ResignedBishop of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal
13 Mar 179470.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Miranda (do Douro), Portugal

MicroData Summary for Miguel António Barreto de Meneses:
Bishop Miguel António Barreto de Meneses (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Miranda (do Douro)

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 130, and Page 291
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1770, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 28 Dec 2015