Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Tavares Coutinho da Silva

Deceased

Bishop of Portalegre, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1724³Born
11 Jan 176742.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
8 Feb 176743.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 177854.3SelectedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
20 Jul 177854.4ConfirmedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
13 Sep 177854.6Ordained BishopBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
30 Nov 177854.8InstalledBishop of Portalegre, Portugal
7 Apr 179874.1DiedBishop of Portalegre, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Tavares Coutinho da Silva
Bishop Manuel Tavares Coutinho da Silva (born , died ) Bishop of Portalegre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCouto de Esteves

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 345
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1778, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017